This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:22:18 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- MILLER

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING -V- MILLER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8062

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BROOKE MILLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BROOKE MILLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,543.48 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,798.98; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BROOKE MILLER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BROOKE MILLER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BROOKE MILLER.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BROOKE MILLER.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0187 $196.00; 170918-0187-CK Reference Number 734487

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,798.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 171226-0121 $25.00; 171226-0121-CK Reference Number 762036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BROOKE MILLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,543.48 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,798.98; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BROOKE MILLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/14/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO BROOKE MILLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUD FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BROOKE MILLER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/27/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0187 $196.00; 170918-0187-CK Reference Number 734487

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less