This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:57:07 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- MEADE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING -V- MEADE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7976

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DEE MEADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0901 $196.00; 170915-0901-CK Reference Number 734485

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DEE MEADE WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DEE MEADE WITH COSTS OF $59.50

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DEE MEADE WITH COSTS OF $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,201.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0901 $196.00; 170915-0901-CK Reference Number 734485

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less