This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 15:05:07 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- MCKINZIE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCKINZIE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4729

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CODY B MCKINZIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS ATLAW

151 Bernal Rd. Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

Defendant Attorney

NATIONAL LITIGATION LAW GROUP,PLLC

42 Shepherd Center 2401 Northwest 23Rd St

Oklahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/28/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ROBERT MORRIS FOR DEFENDANT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:20; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 2 HOURS.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; BENCH TRIAL: ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE-NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C )(F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/28/2017 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC IS SET FOR 05/11/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:21; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DEFENDANT CODY B MCKINZIE FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CODY B MCKINZIE FOR 1ST APP FEE AND FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 171002-0378 $244.00; 171002-0378-MC Reference Number 033-0035708261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY CODY B MCKINZIE; REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY NATIONAL LITIGATIONLAW GROUP,PLLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CODY B MCKINZIE SERVED ON 08/20/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0906 $240.00; 170801-0906-CK Reference Number 721963

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.