This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 05:09:51 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- HAMILTON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAMILTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1382

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

VICTORIA D HAMILTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS ATLAW

151 Bernal Rd. Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST 1033 ATTY FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST 1033 ATTY FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 05/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTORIA D HAMILTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,394.36 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $297.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,691.86; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VICTORIA D HAMILTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VICTORIA D HAMILTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170609-0625 $25.00; 170609-0625-CK Reference Number 712111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ORDERED ENTERED 05/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTORIA D HAMILTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,394.36 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $297.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,691.86; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST 1033 ATTY FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VICTORIA D HAMILTON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO VICTORIA D HAMILTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DECLARATION OF 1788.60(B) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/28/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VICTORIA D HAMILTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161220-0125 $240.00; 161220-0125-CK Reference Number 665390

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.