This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:26:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING-V-DIASHEEN FOSTER

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING-V-DIASHEEN FOSTER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9174

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Defendant

DIASHEEN FOSTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FILED

DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO DIASHEEN FOSTER WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF REDUCED FILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0950 $196.00; 170929-0950-CK Reference Number 0010529877

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less