This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:23:56 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- CAMACHO

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING -V- CAMACHO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8080

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

OSCAR B CAMACHO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OSCAR B CAMACHO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OSCAR B CAMACHO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0840 $196.00; 170918-0840-CK Reference Number 733318

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DEFENDANT OSCAR B CAMACHO FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FOR DEF; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0174 $196.00; 171212-0174-CK Reference Number 757203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0176 $20.00; 171212-0176-CK Reference Number 757202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON OSCAR B CAMACHO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0840 $196.00; 170918-0840-CK Reference Number 733318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less