This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:56:52 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING -V- BARRERA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING -V- BARRERA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7975

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF ATLANTIC

Defendant

MIGUEL BARRERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MIGUEL BARRERA WITH COSTS OF $80.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MIGUEL BARRERA WITH COSTS OF $80.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/ TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MIGUEL BARRERA WITH COSTS OF $112.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180612-0215 $5.00; 180612-0215-MC Reference Number 033-0071891094

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • PLAS OSC RESPONSE RE: SERVICE COMPLETION WITH DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MIGUEL BARRERA WITH COSTS OF $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STEPHEN ZELLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:45; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO EFFECT SERVICE; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/ TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:46; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MIGUEL BARRERA WITH COSTS OF $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLCAS ASSIGNEEOF ATLANTIC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,959.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLCAS ASSIGNEEOF ATLANTIC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0364 $240.00; 170915-0364-CK Reference Number 0757554

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less