This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 09:52:26 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING-V-ANGELA ZAVALA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 MIDLAND FUNDING-V-ANGELA ZAVALA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4503

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Defendant

ANGELA ZAVALA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR FOR ANGELA MARINA ZAVALA AKA ANGELA ROMO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY #6:11-BK-47446-SC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 111213-0780$25.00; 111213-0780-CK Reference Number 704098

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 10/03/11; JUDGMENT FOR: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANGELA ZAVALA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,522.82 INTEREST $167.40 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $261.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,951.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: C.C.P. SECTION 1033; INTEREST; AND EVIDENCE CODE FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2011
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO ANGELA ZAVALA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/08/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0623$196.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less