This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:11:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC -V- TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC -V- TORRES was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9066

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Defendant

STACY TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IN-HOUSE COUNSEL FOR MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO STACY TORRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO STACY TORRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0065 $196.00; 170928-0065-CK Reference Number 0010530903

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO STACY TORRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO STACY TORRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STACY TORRES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STACY TORRES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STACY TORRES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO STACY TORRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO STACY TORRES WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,992.83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0065 $196.00; 170928-0065-CK Reference Number 0010530903

    Read MoreRead Less