This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:05:59 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC -V- PUGA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PUGA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2025

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LIZBETH PUGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEYS ATLAW

151 Bernal Rd. Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED; Minutes; JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DEFENDANT LIZBETH PUGA FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LIZBETH PUGA FOR STIPULATION FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170427-0258 $20.00; 170427-0258-CK Reference Number 701012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LIZBETH PUGA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170427-0257 $240.00; 170427-0257-CK Reference Number 701011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LIZBETH PUGA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $57.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0194 $240.00; 170203-0194-CK Reference Number 678866

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.