This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:21:16 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V MARINA VILLA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARINA VILLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8051

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARINA VILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARINA VILLA WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARINA VILLA WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARINA VILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARINA VILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARINA VILLA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MARINA VILLA WITH COSTS OF $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0842 $196.00; 170915-0842-CK Reference Number CK-734507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less