This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:37:31 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC -V- GIFTY C BANAHENE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIFTY C BANAHENE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1880

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GIFTY C BANAHENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,409.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( $6,434.84 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 171117-0420 $25.00; 171117-0420-CK Reference Number 752938

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0321 $25.00; 170712-0321-CK Reference Number 720178

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • ORDER FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170214-0510 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,050.34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170202-0372 $240.00; 170202-0372-CK Reference Number 678864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.