This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 16:35:15 (UTC).

MICHELLE MEDINA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MICHELLE MEDINA was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0361

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLAUDIA GARCIA

Conservatee

MICHELLE MEDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorneys

HORSPOOL, J. DAVID

300 E State St. Ste 200

Redlands, CA 92373

HORSPOOL & HORSPOOL

300 E State St Suite 200

Redlands, CA 92373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 10/04/2017 OF CLAUDIA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONSERVATEE'S RIGHTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 10/04/2017 OF CLAUDIA GARCIA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY J DAVID HORSPOOL PRESENT FOR MICHELLE MEDINA.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; MATTER IS CONTINUED. ATTORNEY HORSPOOL TO ASSIST THE CONSERVATOR WITH FILING THE REQUIRED; DOCUMENTS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/07/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 09/05/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • HRG OF 09/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • HRG OF 09/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHELLE MEDINA FOR 2 CC LETTERS IN THE AMOUNT OF $53.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON, CLAUDIA GARCIA APPOINTED WITH NO IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, NONE APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHELLE MEDINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING CONSERVATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON LIMITED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less