This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:08:52 (UTC).

MICHELLE HAIRE-N-DONTE HAIRE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MICHELLE HAIRE-N-DONTE HAIRE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8350

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHELLE LEE HAIRE

Respondent

DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCCARTY, ROBERT A

3963 11Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE RE: MOD CC/CV (061318)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY MICHELLE LEE HAIRE RE: MOD VISITATION/OTHER: PRE-HEARING FCS APPT (052918)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ORDER, UCCJEA BY PERSONAL ON 06/13/18 AS TO DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF MICHELLE HAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPT ON 07-24-2018 @ 1PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: COMPLIANCE WITH EXISTING COURT ORDERS FILED BY DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DECLARATION RE NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDER FILED BY DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE RE: MOD CC/CV (061318).

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DONTE DWAYNE HAIRE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHELLE LEE HAIRE FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHELLE LEE HAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO MICHELLE LEE HAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0142 $435.00; 170927-0142-CK Reference Number 7892

    Read MoreRead Less