This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 13:22:48 (UTC).

MICHAEL TERRY V. FOX GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/23/2017 MICHAEL TERRY filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against FOX GROUP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Donna Gunnell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1203

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garza, Donna Gunnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRY, MICHAEL

Defendants

TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION

FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS, INC

NIX, MR. MATT

Not Yet Classified

FOX GROUP

NIX, MATT

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

11/13/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RECORDS BY

11/09/2017: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RECORDS BY

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

11/07/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEI

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEI

NOTICE OF RETURNED MOTION TO REFILE FOR ENTRY OF D

10/05/2017: NOTICE OF RETURNED MOTION TO REFILE FOR ENTRY OF D

NOTICE OF RULING ON TRANSFER TO LOS ANGELES SUPERI

09/27/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON TRANSFER TO LOS ANGELES SUPERI

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

09/25/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL TERRY FILED

09/25/2017: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL TERRY FILED

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT

09/21/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT

NOTICE OF ORDER RE- RELATED CASES FILED BY FOX TEL

09/18/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER RE- RELATED CASES FILED BY FOX TEL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER AND MOTN FOR REL

09/12/2017: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEMURRER AND MOTN FOR REL

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL TERRY FILED

09/12/2017: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL TERRY FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT. JUDGMENT PACKE

09/12/2017: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT. JUDGMENT PACKE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP FO

09/06/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP FO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP FO

09/06/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP FO

NOTICE OF RULING ON 08-16-17 EX PARTE FILED.

08/17/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON 08-16-17 EX PARTE FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. JUDGMENT PACKET

08/16/2017: NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. JUDGMENT PACKET

MOTION RE- FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT SET FOR HEARING

08/15/2017: MOTION RE- FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT SET FOR HEARING

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED TO LA COUNTY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transfer Received; Comment: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RECORDS BY MAIL DATED 11/03/17 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER COURT RECORD, CASE WAS TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGE LES COUNTY ON 10/19/.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL TERRY FOR FAX FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL TERRY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL TERRY IS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL TERRY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fox Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION is a litigant