This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:55:35 (UTC).

MICHAEL NUNEZ -N- MARICELA NUNEZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MICHAEL NUNEZ -N- MARICELA NUNEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8551

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL NUNEZ

Respondent

MARICELA NUNEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF MICHAEL NUNEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF MICHAEL NUNEZ; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DEBORAH A DANIEL, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; COURT REPORTER CHELSEA GIULIANY 13842; BAILIFF: C J SANCHEZ; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER MICHAEL NUNEZ PRESENT; RESPONDENT MARICELA NUNEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL.; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE / IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; 10:08; PETITIONERS EXHIBIT(S) 1 - EC730 VOCATIONAL EVALUATION DATED 06/15/2018 MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PETITIONERS EXHIBIT(S) 1 - EC730 VOCATIONAL EVALUATION BY DAVID L. LAINE, M.R.C.,CRC,CCM; DATED 06/15/2018 ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE.; COURT FINDS:; COURT FINDS PARTIES DO NOT WAIVE FINAL DECLARATIONS OF DISCLOSURE. PARTIES ORDERED TO; COMPLY WITH FINAL DISCLOSURE REQUIREMENTS AND FILE/SERVE AN FL-141 PRIOR TO 07/20/2018.; MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION.; REASON: PETITIONER MICHAEL NUNEZ SHALL PROVIDE FURTHER DOCUMENTATION TO THE COURT.; PETITIONER MICHAEL NUNEZ IS ORDERED TO FILE AND SERVE INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS 14 DAYS PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING.; COURT ORDERS MICHAEL NUNEZ TO FILE AND SERVE AN INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION WITH TWO WEEKS; CURRENT PAY STUBS ATTACHED PRIOR TO 08/24/2018.; REFERRED; PARTIES REFERRED TO THE FAMILY LAW RESOURCE CENTER FOR ASSISTANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S51.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHAEL NUNEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF I&E DECLARATION BY MAIL ON 07/03/18 AS TO MARICELA NUNEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MARICELA NUNEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • FURTHER MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DEBORAH A DANIEL, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR; COURT REPORTER ALICIA LINDSEY 13895; BAILIFF: C J SANCHEZ; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER MICHAEL NUNEZ PRESENT; RESPONDENT MARICELA NUNEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE / IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; MATTER IS CONTESTED; COURT TRIAL REQUESTED.; THE COURT DETERMINES THAT THE ISSUES TO BE RESOLVED AT THE TIME OF TRIAL ARE STATUS AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS TWO HOURS.; COURT REPORTER FEES ARE WAIVED.; PARTIES ARE / IS ORDERED TO FILE AND SERVE INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS 10 DAYS PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING.; COURT ORDERS BOTH PARTIES TO FILE AND SERVE UPDATED FL-150 INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATIONS; WITH ATTACHED CURRENT PAY STUBS PRIOR TO 07/03/2018.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF MICHAEL NUNEZ IS SET FOR 07/10/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S51; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DEBORAH A DANIEL, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: PAULINE RODRIGUEZ; COURT REPORTER GIGI LEDESMA 8538; BAILIFF: C J SANCHEZ; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER MICHAEL NUNEZ PRESENT; RESPONDENT MARICELA NUNEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION; COURT APPOINTS REGAIN PURSUANT TO EC730. THE REPORT SHALL BE ADMISSIBLE WITHOUT FOUNDATION, SUBJECT TO CROSS EXAMINATION IF RECEIVED 10 DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING.; EACH PARTY IS ORDERED TO COOPERATE. PETITIONER MICHAEL NUNEZ TO ADVANCE THE COST, SUBJECT TO REALLOCATION.; MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION.; REASON: RECEIPT OF EC730 EVALUATION; HEARINGS:; FURTHER MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S51; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SETTLEMENT CONF BRIEF, PROPERTY DEC BY PERSONAL ON 04/10/18 AS TO MARICELA NUNEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION, EXHIBITS BY PERSONAL ON 04/13/18 AS TO MICHAEL NUNEZ, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF FILED BY MARICELA NUNEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARICELA NUNEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL NUNEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL NUNEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL NUNEZ FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MICHAEL NUNEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less