This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:22:47 (UTC).

MICHAEL L. ANGELL AKA MICHAEL ANGELL AKA ETC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 MICHAEL L ANGELL AKA MICHAEL ANGELL AKA ETC was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0924

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARK L. ANGELL

Decedent

MICHAEL L. ANGELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JENSEN, DENNIS L

18377 Beach Blvd., Ste. 212 Huntington Beach

Ca, CA 92648

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 12/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/12/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY WESCOM CREDIT UNION. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,585.68.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARK L. ANGELL FOR 4 CERTIFIED COPIES OF LETTERS FILED 12/12/17; Minutes; Receipt: 180301-0946 $102.00; 180301-0946-CK Reference Number 1216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • NOTICE DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATOR, LIMITED IAEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MARK L ANGELL APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND IS NOT REQ., B.M.GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ LIMITED AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER STEPHANIE LEWIS 12746; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/18/2017 OF MARK ANGELL IS GRANTED; MARK L. ANGELL IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: ADMINISTRATOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH LIMITED POWERS.; NO BOND IS REQUIRED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 02/19/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/18/2017 OF MARK ANGELL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PROBATE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH LIMITED AUTHORITY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARK L. ANGELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170919-1124 $465.00; 170919-1124-CK Reference Number 1196

    Read MoreRead Less