This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 01:47:24 (UTC).

MICHAEL BURDETTE -V- PALM COMMUNITIES

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 MICHAEL BURDETTE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PALM COMMUNITIES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0271

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL BURDETTE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

H D SUPPLY

FONTANA TOSCANA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PALM COMMUNITIES

LOUISVILLE LADDER CO

WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY,INC.

HD SUPPLY FACILITIES MAINTENANCE, L.P.

FONTANA TOSCANA, L.P.

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

LOUISVILLE LADDER CO.

LOUISVILLE LADDER INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PALM COMMUNITIES

FONTANA TOSCANA, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LERNER, MOORE, SILVA, CUNNINGHAM, & RUBEL

141 North Arrowhead Avenue Suite 1

San Bernardino, CA 92415

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

1901 Orange Tree Lane Ste 100

Redlands, CA 92375

KLINEDINST PC

5 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 1000

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KLINEDINST PC

5 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 1000

Santa Ana, CA 92707

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/31/18 WITH COSTS OF $150.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/31/18 WITH COSTS OF $150.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF MICHAEL BURDETTE FILED CHANGING NAME OF WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY,INC. TO WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC.;

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF MICHAEL BURDETTE FILED CHANGING NAME OF WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY,INC. TO WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC.;

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES NAMING ROES 2 TO BE H D SUPPLY FILED

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES NAMING ROES 2 TO BE H D SUPPLY FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES NAMING ROES 1 TO BE LOUISVILLE LADDER CO. FILED

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES NAMING ROES 1 TO BE LOUISVILLE LADDER CO. FILED

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF MICHAEL BURDETTE BY PALM COMMUNITIES, FONTANA TOSCANA, L.P.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/01/2016 OF MICHAEL BURDETTE BY PALM COMMUNITIES, FONTANA TOSCANA, L.P.

ANSWER FILED BY HD SUPPLY FACILITIES MAINTENANCE, L.P.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KLINEDINST PC.

ANSWER FILED BY HD SUPPLY FACILITIES MAINTENANCE, L.P.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KLINEDINST PC.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161201-0661 $435.00; 161201-0661-CK Reference Number 24202

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FONTANA TOSCANA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP SERVED ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $77.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FONTANA TOSCANA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP SERVED ON 06/06/17 WITH FEES OF $77.00.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LOUISVILLE LADDER CO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LOUISVILLE LADDER CO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY PALM COMMUNITIES, FONTANA TOSCANA, L.P.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY PALM COMMUNITIES, FONTANA TOSCANA, L.P.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE COURT DOES NOT FILE THESE. THEY ARE EXCHANGED BETWEEN THE PARTIES ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES FOR HD SUPPLY FACILITIES MAINTENANCE, L.P., ADD HD SUPPLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES, H D SUPPLY REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY HD SUPPLY FACILITIES MAINTENANCE, L.P.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KLINEDINST PC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/18/2017 OF PALM COMMUNITIES, HD SUPPLY FACILITIES MAINTENANCE, L.P. IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DARLA CUNNINGHAM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; LING LIU APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PALM COMMUNITIES, FONTANA TOSCANA, L.P..; KELSEY MAXWELL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LOUISVILLE LADDER INC.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY,INC., H D SUPPLY; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATTORNEY MAXWELL REPRESENTS CROSS-DEFENDANT LOUISVILLE LADDER, INC., DEFENDANT LOUISVILLE; LADDER, INC., IS IN DEFAULT.; ATTORNEY CUNNINGHAM STATES THAT DEFENDANT WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION IS A DBA FOR HD SUPPLY.; PLEADINGS ARE PROPER AND THE ISSUES JOINED.; JURY DEMANDED BY ALL PARTIES.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 7-10 DAY(S).; PLAINTIFF TO POST JURY FEES; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 02/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/11/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S32 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 10 DAYS.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTY CUNNINGHAM (W/ DEPT. S32 TRIAL REQUIREMENTS).; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; DARLA CUNNINGHAM APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MICHAEL BURDETTE.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • FILE ROUTED TO S32 FOR 6/9 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY MICHAEL BURDETTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161201-0661 $435.00; 161201-0661-CK Reference Number 24202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.