Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 23:03:51 (UTC).

MGR PROPERTY MGMT-V-WILLAIM GERMANY

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 MGR PROPERTY MGMT-V-WILLAIM GERMANY was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1186

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant

WILLIAM GERMANY

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES M. BLUCKER, ATTORNEY AT LAW

1425 W. Foothill Blvd. Ste 300

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/31/2017 OF MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM GERMANY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,350.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $250.00 COSTS $545.00 AND DAMAGES $1,620.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,765.00; ACTION - COMPLETE

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/31/2017 OF MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. ORDERED ENTERED 06/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM GERMANY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: WILLIAM GERMANY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WILLIAM GERMANY FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WILLIAM GERMANY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/01/17 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/01/17 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON WILLIAM GERMANY; PARTY SERVED ON 06/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON WILLIAM GERMANY; PARTY SERVED ON 06/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170531-0213 $255.00; 170531-0213-VS Reference Number 026-0047463536

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/31/2017 OF MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC. GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM GERMANY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,350.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $250.00 COSTS $545.00 AND DAMAGES $1,620.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,765.00; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 07/06/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $545.00, ATTORNEY FEES $250.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • D&O RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/31/2017 OF MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/01/17 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON WILLIAM GERMANY; PARTY SERVED ON 06/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $45.00.--BEGINNING ON 06/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170531-0213 $255.00; 170531-0213-VS Reference Number 026-0047463536

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUCKER JAMES MICHAEL