This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 00:42:59 (UTC).

(MF) YODRUNGRUENG -V- ZEBAYEL BAYE

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 MF YODRUNGRUENG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZEBAYEL BAYE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0610

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG

BRITTANY SOLA

JORGE SOLA

ZEBAYEL AKELE BAYE

TIGIST YADETA

ZABAYEL BAYE

ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE

HELEN COURTNEY

ZEBAYEL BAYE

TIGIST TADETA

Minors

DIEGO SOLA

SIENA SOLA

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

INTO CHAMPON & ASSOC

1909 W Valley Blvd

Alhambra, CA 91803

GNAU & TAMEZ LAW GROUP, LLP

3666 Fourth Ave

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GIBEAUT MAHAN & BRISCOE

6701 Center Drive West Ste 611

Los Angeles, CA 90045

WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1111 East Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite 113

Palm Springs, CA 92262

WINET, PATRICK, GAYER, CREIGHTON & HANES

1199 East Ramon Road

Palm Springs, CA 92264

LAW OFFICES OF VIVIAN L SCHWARTZ

P.O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/01/2016 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FILED BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/01/2016 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FILED BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/01/2016 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FILED BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/01/2016 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FILED BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, WITH PREJUDICE.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JORGE SOLA, BRITTANY SOLA, DIEGO SOLA, SIENA SOLA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JORGE SOLA, BRITTANY SOLA, DIEGO SOLA, SIENA SOLA.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE, WITH PREJUDICE

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2016 OF HELEN COURTNEY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2016 OF HELEN COURTNEY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/11/2016 OF JORGE SOLA BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/11/2016 OF JORGE SOLA BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

ANSWER FILED BY ZABAYEL BAYE, TIGIST YADETA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WINET PATRICK GAYERCREIGHTON &HANES.

ANSWER FILED BY ZABAYEL BAYE, TIGIST YADETA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WINET PATRICK GAYERCREIGHTON &HANES.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CIVDS1510610/CIVDS1600229) FILED BY JORGE SOLA.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (CIVDS1510610/CIVDS1600229) FILED BY JORGE SOLA.

ORDER CASE #CIVDS1510610 AND CIVDS1600229 CONSIDERED RELATED BUT NOT CONSOLIDATED FILED

ORDER CASE #CIVDS1510610 AND CIVDS1600229 CONSIDERED RELATED BUT NOT CONSOLIDATED FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONSOLIDATE WITH CIVDS 1600229 FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONSOLIDATE WITH CIVDS 1600229 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ANSWER FILED BY ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WINET, PATRICK, GAYER, CREIGHTON & HANES.

ANSWER FILED BY ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WINET, PATRICK, GAYER, CREIGHTON & HANES.; Minutes; Receipt: 150902-1320 $435.00; 150902-1320-CK Reference Number 3228

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/01/2016 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FILED BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/01/2016 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FILED BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, ON 05/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/27/2015 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FILED BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, ON 05/01/17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2016 OF HELEN COURTNEY FILED BY HELEN COURTNEY, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF HELEN COURTNEY, ON 04/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/03/2016 OF ZEBAYEL BAYE FILED BY ZABAYEL BAYE, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF ZABAYEL BAYE, ON 04/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; JACK BRISCOE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG.; ATTORNEY DANIEL KRUID PRESENT FOR HELEN COURTNEY.; (NOT PRESENT WHEN MATTER CALLED); PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT THIS MATTER HAS SETTLED.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) SET FOR 06/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 01/11/2016 OF JORGE SOLA FILED BY JORGE SOLA, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF JORGE SOLA, ON 04/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 03/06/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON 10319; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRITNEY MALPIEDE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, JORGE SOLA, BRITTANY SOLA, DIEGO SOLA, SIENA SOLA.; ATTORNEY CHRISTIE BEARD PRESENT FOR HELEN COURTNEY.; ATTORNEY SARAH SORENSON PRESENT FOR ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/20/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23.; COUNSEL FOR ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/27/2015 OF NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG, ZABAYEL AKELE BAYE IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • ANSWER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST ANSWER EXACTLY AS SUED OR STATE ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS. SEE ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NITTAYA YODRUNGRUENG FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 150728-0084 $435.00; 150728-0084-CK Reference Number 25189

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.