This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/09/2018 at 02:51:49 (UTC).

*MF* VALENTINA HERNANDEZ VS DILLSTAR

Case Summary

On 12/09/2011 MF VALENTINA HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DILLSTAR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0614

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

VALENTINA N HERNANDEZ

HENRY STICKNEY

DILLSTAR PRODUCTIONS, INC

BEVERLY STICKNEY

VALENTINA NICHOLE ESTRADA

Defendants, Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

HENRY STICKNEY

DILLSTAR PRODUCTIONS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

STUART E COHEN

23801 Calabasas Road Suite 100

Calabasas, CA 91302

HAFIF & ASSOCIATES, LLP

3175-E Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HAFIF & ASSOCIATES, LLP

3175-E Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

STUART E COHEN

23801 Calabasas Road Suite 100

Calabasas, CA 91302

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2013
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: GABRIELA LEE; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; BAILIFF: T ORTEGA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; 08:33; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: MATTER SETTLED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DILLSTAR PRODUCTIONS, INC FILED BY DILLSTAR PRODUCTIONS, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF DILLSTAR PRODUCTIONS, INC, ON 11/13/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • CONFIDENTIAL STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINA L. BANDFIELD; COURT REPORTER BETTY KELLEY 3981; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STUART COHEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF VALENTINA N HERNANDEZ PRESENT; ATTORNEY CYNTHIA HAFIF PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT HENRY STICKNEY PRESENT; DEFENDANT BEVERLY STICKNEY PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL RECITE AN ORAL STIPULATION INTO THE RECORD AND WAIVE THE COURT CLERK FROM RECORDING SAID STIPULATION.; COURT ORDERS THE SETTLEMENT CONFIDENTIAL AND SEALS THE TRANSCRIPT FROM TODAYS PROCEEDINGS.; HEARINGS:; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 11/29/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JOSEPH R. BRISCO, JUDGE; CLERK: MARLENE GALINDO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STUART COHEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY CYNTHIA HAFIF PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; MEDIATOR MATT DUDICS FROM IFHMB PRESENT.; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS SETTLED.; MATTER SENT TO R10 FOR SETTLEMENT ON THE RECORD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/29/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 023-0138107483

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFFS VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENC BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 121029-0143 $17.45; 121029-0143-VS Reference Number 023-0138107483

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS FILED AS TO VALENTINA N HERNANDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF VALENTINA N HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/09/2011 OF VALENTINA HERNANDEZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 111209-1561 $395.00; 111209-1561-CK Reference Number 1058

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS FILED AS TO VALENTINA NICHOLE ESTRADA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/26/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/09/2011 OF VALENTINA HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/09/2011 OF VALENTINA HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less