This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/04/2018 at 01:49:57 (UTC).

*MF* BLISS-V-KEAGLE

Case Summary

On 11/23/2010 MF BLISS-V-KEAGLE was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2506

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAROLE A BLISS

DUAYNE D BLISS

Defendants

RIVERSIDE PARTNERSHIP

CDL RESTAURANTS, INC

C & C ORGANIZATION, INC

CHARLES L KEAGLE

CUCAMONGA RESTAURANTS, LLC

CASK-SAN DIMAS, INC

CASK-SAN DIMAS INC

CUCAMONGA CASK ANDCLEAVER

LINDA KEAGLE

CUCAMONGA RESTAURANTS, INC

CORONA RESTAURANTS, INC

THE C & C ORGANIZATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRESHAM SAVAGE NOLAN & TILDEN

3403 Tenth Street Suite 700

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant Attorneys

BUXBAUM & CHAKMAK

414 Yale Avenue Suite K

Claremont, CA 91711-4387

REEDER & ASSOCIATES

400 N Mountain Ave Suite 215

Upland, CA 91786

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2014
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • HEARING RE-ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CCP 664.6 JURISDICTION OF COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DUAYNE D BLISS FOR STIP/ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 140421-0899 $20.00; 140421-0899-VS Reference Number 023-0205215953; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CHARLES L KEAGLE, CUCAMONGA RESTAURANTS, INC, LINDA KEAGLE, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT CHARLES L KEAGLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO RIVERSIDE PARTNERSHIP, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
224 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/23/2010 OF DUAYNE BLISS, CUCAMONGA RESTAURANTS, LLC IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER FILED BY CHARLES L KEAGLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/22/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMMPLAINT FILED AS TO CHARLES L KEAGLE. PARTY SERVED ON 11/29/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $96.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CHARLES L KEAGLE. PARTY SERVED ON 11/29/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $96.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 101123-2918 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less