This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:57:58 (UTC).

MERRICK BANK -V- SCHROEDER

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MERRICK BANK -V- SCHROEDER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7985

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER FILED.

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP 1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP 1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0946 $240.00; 170918-0946-CK Reference Number 736528

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER WITH COSTS OF $59.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER WITH COSTS OF $59.50

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,446.81 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,746.31; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180521-0086 $25.00; 180521-0086-CK Reference Number 800521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 1771.31 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 1771.31 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION FOR WRIT TO L.A.; Minutes; Receipt: 180214-0984 $25.00; 180214-0984-CK Reference Number 773229

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180111-0077 $25.00; 180111-0077-CK Reference Number 766189

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION AS TO CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP 1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CHRISTOPHER SCHROEDER WITH COSTS OF $59.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/30/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,446.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0946 $240.00; 170918-0946-CK Reference Number 736528

    Read MoreRead Less