This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:22:48 (UTC).

MERRICK BANK -V- GIL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MERRICK BANK -V- GIL was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8068

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

Defendant

JONATHAN S GIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Rd Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JONATHAN S GIL SERVED ON 10/25/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JONATHAN S GIL SERVED ON 10/25/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0226 $240.00; 170918-0226-CK Reference Number 736511

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JONATHAN S GIL FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JONATHAN S GIL FILED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JONATHAN S GIL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,387.98 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,687.48; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180111-0063 $25.00; 180111-0063-CK Reference Number 766184

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JONATHAN S GIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION AS TO JONATHAN S GIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST, CCP1033, ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF MERRICK BANK CORPORATION ORDERED ENTERED 12/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JONATHAN S GIL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,387.98 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $299.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,687.48; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JONATHAN S GIL SERVED ON 10/25/17 WITH FEES OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0226 $240.00; 170918-0226-CK Reference Number 736511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less