This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:04:31 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ VS TURNER

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MERCEDES-BENZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TURNER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7667

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO

Defendants

KENANA ADESHILAA TURNER

KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER. PARTY SERVED ON 10/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $70.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER. PARTY SERVED ON 10/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $70.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO REPRESENTED BY KIM BYRON.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:12; KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; KIM BYRON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER.; JUDGMENT FOR: MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $120.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,120.00; 10:13; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0768 $50.00; 171004-0768-CK Reference Number CK 18572

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO REPRESENTED BY KIM BYRON.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:12; KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; KIM BYRON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER.; JUDGMENT FOR: MERCEDES-BENZ OF ONTARIO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $120.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,120.00; 10:13; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER. PARTY SERVED ON 10/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0768 $50.00; 171004-0768-CK Reference Number CK 18572

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PARTY KEANA ADESHILAA TURNER UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less