This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 07:21:25 (UTC).

MENESES VS CORTEZ

Case Summary

On 04/13/2010 MENESES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CORTEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0192

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATT MENESES

Defendants

VERONICA CORTEZ

ANTHONY CORTEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLENN R TRAVIS

4275 Lemon St #201

Riverside, CA 92501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( RETURNED TO ATTY IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 100603-1700 $25.00; 100603-1700-CK Reference Number 43893

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:33 HRS.; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT PRESIDING.; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: F. JOLLEVET; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MATT MENESES PRESENT; ATTORNEY GLENN TRAVIS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT ANTHONY CORTEZ, VERONICA CORTEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 09:11; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; MATT MENESES IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 1-RENTAL AGREEMENT (AS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT) MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 2-JOE KOOLS AC & HEATING INVOICE DATED 3/7/10 MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 1 AND 2 ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 3- 3 DAY NOTICE & PROOF OF SERVICE (BY REFERENCE) MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S) 3 ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; ANTHONY CORTES IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANTS.; DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT(S) 1-COLOR COPIES OF 12 8X10 PHOTOGRAPHS OF PROPERTY MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION.; DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT(S) 1 ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE.; VERONICA CORTES IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANTS.; DEFENDANTS RESTS.; REBUTTAL BY PLAINTIFF; 09:33; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/13/2010 OF MATT MENESES ORDERED ENTERED 05/14/10; JUDGMENT FOR: MATT MENESES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANTHONY CORTEZ, VERONICA CORTEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,200.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $340.00 AND DAMAGES $560.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,500.00; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANTHONY CORTEZ, VERONICA CORTEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/13/2010 OF MATT MENESES AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY VERONICA CORTEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON VERONICA CORTEZ; POSTED ON 04/16/10 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ANTHONY CORTEZ; POSTED ON 04/16/10 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANTHONY CORTEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY VERONICA CORTEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY ANTHONY CORTEZ, VERONICA CORTEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100416-6020 $20.00; 100416-6020-CK Reference Number 43756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100413-2891 $235.00; 100413-2891-CK Reference Number 43705

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.