Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 03:59:15 (UTC).

MENDOZA VS LOPEZ/GARCIA

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 MENDOZA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ/GARCIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4164

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT T MENDOZA

Defendants

FRANK LOPEZ

AMANDA GARCIA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD M PALMER

229 N Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED AT THE COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED AT THE COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170802-0428 $25.00

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:25; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT AMANDA GARCIA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FRANK LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; ROBERTA REYNOLDS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- AMANDA GARCIA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEFENDANT .; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/16/2017 OF ROBERT MENDOZA ORDERED ENTERED 08/02/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROBERT T MENDOZA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FRANK LOPEZ, AMANDA GARCIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,100.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $375.00 AND DAMAGES $1,210.11.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,185.11; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: FRANK LOPEZ, AMANDA GARCIA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 11:03; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED. (IMAGED)

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANK LOPEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/27/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANK LOPEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/27/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/05/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/05/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH EDWARD M PALMER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROBERT T MENDOZA.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH EDWARD M PALMER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROBERT T MENDOZA.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMANDA GARCIA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/05/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMANDA GARCIA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/05/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY FRANK LOPEZ, AMANDA GARCIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY FRANK LOPEZ, AMANDA GARCIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANK LOPEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/27/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANK LOPEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/27/17

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170616-0497 $255.00; 170616-0497-CK Reference Number 2544

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • AUDIO CD AND AUDIO UPLOAD OF THE ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED PROCEEDINGS HELD ON 08/02/17, PURCHASED BY FRANK LOPEZ; Minutes; Receipt: 170821-0110 $22.00; 170821-0110-DB Reference Number 031-0036844045

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • AUDIO CD AND AUDIO UPLOAD COMPLETED ON 08/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • AUDIO CD AND AUDIO UPLOAD OF THE ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED PROCEEDINGS HELD ON 08/10/17, PURCHASED BY DEFENDANT; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0172 $22.00; 170810-0172-DB Reference Number 031-0034306691

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED AT THE COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170802-0428 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:25; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD PALMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT AMANDA GARCIA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FRANK LOPEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; ROBERTA REYNOLDS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- AMANDA GARCIA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEFENDANT .; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/16/2017 OF ROBERT MENDOZA ORDERED ENTERED 08/02/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROBERT T MENDOZA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FRANK LOPEZ, AMANDA GARCIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,100.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $375.00 AND DAMAGES $1,210.11.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,185.11; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: FRANK LOPEZ, AMANDA GARCIA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 11:03; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANK LOPEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 06/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FRANK LOPEZ FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170622-0320 $6.50; 170622-0320-DB Reference Number 031-0021677070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY FRANK LOPEZ FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170622-0316 $2.23; 170622-0316-DB Reference Number 031-0021677070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT T MENDOZA FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170616-0503 $25.50; 170616-0503-VS Reference Number 031-0020201280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170616-0497 $255.00; 170616-0497-CK Reference Number 2544

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $36.67.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD M PALMER