This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 10:36:13 (UTC).

MENDOZA-V-REYES

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 MENDOZA-V-REYES was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0228

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YOLANDA VASQUEZ

FRANCISCO J MENDOZA

Defendants

LINO CHAVEZ DEL RIO

LILIAN REYES

LILIANA REYES

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: T NANCARROW; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT LILIANA REYES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR MOTION TO VACATE.; 09:02; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; LILIANA REYES'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; WITNESS -- LILIANA REYES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- YOLANDA VASQUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- FRANCISCO MENDOZA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA.; FOR IMPROPER SERVICE.; SMALL CLAIMS PROCEEDS:; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA ORDERED ENTERED 05/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LILIANA REYES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,105.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: T NANCARROW; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT LILIANA REYES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR MOTION TO VACATE.; 09:02; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; LILIANA REYES'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; WITNESS -- LILIANA REYES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- YOLANDA VASQUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- FRANCISCO MENDOZA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA.; FOR IMPROPER SERVICE.; SMALL CLAIMS PROCEEDS:; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA ORDERED ENTERED 05/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LILIANA REYES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,105.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LILIANA REYES, LINO CHAVEZ DEL RIO; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:55; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; TRIAL PROCEEDS AS TO LILIANA REYES ONLY.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT LINO CHAVEZ DEL RIO WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; WITNESS -- FRANCISCO J MENDOZA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- YOLANDA VASQUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AND SUBSEQUENTLY RULED UPON.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA ORDERED ENTERED 04/10/17; JUDGMENT FOR 05/08/17.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 05/08/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,105.50; ESCROW NUMBER 1-54285-TH DEPOSITED WITH CIMARRON ESCROW DEPOSITED BY CESAR A. INIGUEZ FBO LILIANA; REYES AND LINO CHAVEXZ DEL RIO IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,000.00.; (EXPIRED ESCROW); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO LILIANA REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO LILIANA REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0920 $55.50

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 05/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: T NANCARROW; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ PRESENT; DEFENDANT LILIANA REYES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR MOTION TO VACATE.; 09:02; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; LILIANA REYES'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; WITNESS -- LILIANA REYES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- YOLANDA VASQUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- FRANCISCO MENDOZA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA.; FOR IMPROPER SERVICE.; SMALL CLAIMS PROCEEDS:; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA ORDERED ENTERED 05/08/17; JUDGMENT FOR: FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LILIANA REYES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,105.50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • PARTY YOLANDA VASQUEZ UPDATED: YOLANDA VASQUEZ ADDRESS PUT IN CORRECT SPACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • PARTY LILIANA REYES UPDATED: DEFENDANTS ADDRESS AS ON MOTION TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MOTION TO VACATE 5/8/17 8:30AM DEPT. B4 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170426-0396 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY LILIANA REYES. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170426-0394 $20.00; 170426-0394-VS Reference Number 026-0032275814

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FRANCISCO J MENDOZA, YOLANDA VASQUEZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LILIANA REYES, LINO CHAVEZ DEL RIO; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:55; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; TRIAL PROCEEDS AS TO LILIANA REYES ONLY.; ON COURTS'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT LINO CHAVEZ DEL RIO WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; WITNESS -- FRANCISCO J MENDOZA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- YOLANDA VASQUEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AND SUBSEQUENTLY RULED UPON.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF FRANCISCO MENDOZA ORDERED ENTERED 04/10/17; JUDGMENT FOR 05/08/17.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 05/08/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $105.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,105.50; ESCROW NUMBER 1-54285-TH DEPOSITED WITH CIMARRON ESCROW DEPOSITED BY CESAR A. INIGUEZ FBO LILIANA; REYES AND LINO CHAVEXZ DEL RIO IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,000.00.; (EXPIRED ESCROW); STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • PARTY LILIANA REYES UPDATED: DEF FIRST NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO LILIANA REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/18/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0920 $55.50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.