This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:16:54 (UTC).

MENDEZ -V- SEABERRY

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 MENDEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SEABERRY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1566

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIO C MENDEZ

Defendant

ASHLEY SEABERRY

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF JULIO MENDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 07/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JULIO C MENDEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ASHLEY SEABERRY; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ASHLEY SEABERRY. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ASHLEY SEABERRY.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ASHLEY SEABERRY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ASHLEY SEABERRY; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ASHLEY SEABERRY; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • COPIES OF DEFAULT PACKET FROM PRO PER P/U BIN DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JULIO C MENDEZ FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF JULIO MENDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 07/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JULIO C MENDEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ASHLEY SEABERRY; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ASHLEY SEABERRY. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ASHLEY SEABERRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF JULIO MENDEZ AS TO ASHLEY SEABERRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JULIO C MENDEZ FOR GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JULIO C MENDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JULIO C MENDEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JULIO C MENDEZ FOR GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less