This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 10:30:55 (UTC).

MENDEZ -V- ROGERS

Case Summary

On 11/22/2011 MENDEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROGERS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0651

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA MENDEZ

Defendants

JEFF ROGERS

JULIE ROGERS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 11/22/2011 OF MARIA MENDEZ GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIA MENDEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JEFF ROGERS, JULIE ROGERS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,100.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $555.00 AND DAMAGES $3,010.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,065.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 111216-1823 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 11/22/2011 OF MARIA MENDEZ ORDERED ENTERED 12/08/11; JUDGMENT FOR: MARIA MENDEZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JEFF ROGERS, JULIE ROGERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARIA MENDEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JEFF ROGERS, JULIE ROGERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 11/22/2011 OF MARIA MENDEZ AS TO JEFF ROGERS, JULIE ROGERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 11/22/2011 OF MARIA MENDEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 11/22/11 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JEFF ROGERS, JULIE ROGERS; PARTY SERVED ON 11/22/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 111123-3068 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMOTHY B. LIEGAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B.