This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:55:54 (UTC).

MENDEZ, ET AL VS IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS

Case Summary

On 10/24/2018 MENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7685

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

CLARA MENDEZ

ANA LEMUS

ESTHER BUZO DE RAMIREZ

ROSIO FAVELA

CRISTINA MADRIGAL

Defendants and Respondents

TERESA DEJESUS BENITEZ

IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

BROWN ASSOCIATES

6320 Van Nuys Blvd Suite 208

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MCKAY, DE LORIMIER& ACAIN

3250 Wilshire Blvd Suite 603

Los Angeles, CA 90010-1578

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER(S) TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FILED.

NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER(S) TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FILED.

NOTICE VACATING NOTICE OF DEFAULT FILED

NOTICE VACATING NOTICE OF DEFAULT FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR APPELLANTS DESIGNATIONS. FILED.

CLERK'S NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL DEFAULT FOR APPELLANTS DESIGNATIONS. FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/15/19 FILED BY IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL, TERESA DEJESUS BENITEZ. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/15/19 FILED BY IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL, TERESA DEJESUS BENITEZ. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL SERVED ON 12/10/18 WITH FEES OF $64.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL SERVED ON 12/10/18 WITH FEES OF $64.50.

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: HEARING DATE OF DEFTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: HEARING DATE OF DEFTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED.

DECLARATION RE: MEET AND CONFER FILED BY IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL, TERESA DEJESUS BENITEZ

DECLARATION RE: MEET AND CONFER FILED BY IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL, TERESA DEJESUS BENITEZ

DEMURRER FILED BY IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL, TERESA DEJESUS BENITEZ; REPRESENTED BY MCKAY, DE LORIMIER& ACAIN(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL, TERESA DEJESUS BENITEZ; REPRESENTED BY MCKAY, DE LORIMIER& ACAIN(IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL WITH COSTS OF $84.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO IGLESIA DE CRISTO MINISTERIOS LLAMADA FINAL WITH COSTS OF $84.50

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. PAY R.ALLEN $90 FOR REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. PAY APPEALS $229.50 FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DELIVERY AND CERTIFICATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER(S) TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. APPELLANT PAID $53 FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. APPELLANT PAID $50 FOR RT/$50 FOR TRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CLARA MENDEZ FOR APPELLANT PAID $50 FOR RT/$50 FOR TRUST; Minutes; Receipt: 190613-0701 $100.00; 190613-0701-CK Reference Number 3563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CLARA MENDEZ FOR APPELLANT PAID $53 FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPTS; Minutes; Receipt: 190613-0698 $53.00; 190613-0698-CK Reference Number 3563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. RESPONDENT PAID $76.50 FOR CLERKS TRANSCRIPTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DEPOSIT AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER FILED. RESPONDENT PAID $40 FOR RT/$50 FOR TRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • HEARING RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT FINDS CASE NUMBERS CIVDS1807346 AND CIVDS1827685 TO BE RELATED TO CIVDS1724956.; MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT S30; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 04/23/19 CONFIRMED.; (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • PLAINTIFF CLARA MENDEZ, ESTHER BUZO DE RAMIREZ, ROSIO FAVELA, ANA LEMUS, CRISTINA MADRIGAL FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CLARA MENDEZ, ESTHER BUZO DE RAMIREZ, ROSIO FAVELA, ANA LEMUS, CRISTINA MADRIGAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CLARA MENDEZ FOR 1ST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 181024-0782 $435.00; 181024-0782-CK Reference Number 3198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.