This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 07:17:17 (UTC).

MENA -V- KING

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 MENA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAUL MENA

Defendant

RAHMANEISHA KING

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170130-0545 $25.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/04/2017 OF RAUL MENA ORDERED ENTERED 01/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RAUL MENA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAHMANEISHA KING; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RAHMANEISHA KING. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAHMANEISHA KING.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAHMANEISHA KING.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RAHMANEISHA KING; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/05/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RAHMANEISHA KING; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/05/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170104-0274 $255.00; 170104-0274-CK Reference Number 1124

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170130-0545 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/04/2017 OF RAUL MENA ORDERED ENTERED 01/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RAUL MENA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RAHMANEISHA KING; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: RAHMANEISHA KING. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON RAHMANEISHA KING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/04/2017 OF RAUL MENA AS TO RAHMANEISHA KING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): REQUEST FOR DEFAULT WAS DEFAULT ONLY NO CLERKS JUD GMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON RAHMANEISHA KING; PARTY SERVED ON 01/05/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • ** VOID ** REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING AB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $21.67.--BEGINNING ON 12/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170104-0274 $255.00; 170104-0274-CK Reference Number 1124

    Read MoreRead Less