This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 14:32:11 (UTC).

MELANY SINGH -N- SUKHDEEP SINGH

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 MELANY SINGH -N- SUKHDEEP SINGH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0708

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MELANY SINGH

Respondent

SUKHDEEP SINGH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 08/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF MELANY SINGH FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF MELANY SINGH ORDERED ENTERED 04/18/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MELANY SINGH FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SUKHDEEP SINGH FOR PRELIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SUKHDEEP SINGH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 01/31/2017 OF MELANY SINGH AS TO SUKHDEEP SINGH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUKHDEEP SINGH; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/03/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MELANY SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0592 $435.00; 170131-0592-VS Reference Number 031-0005948190

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.