Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 13:00:31 (UTC).

MEGANN ANN-ROMERO CERVANTES-V-HECTOR B CERVANTES

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 MEGANN ANN-ROMERO CERVANTES-V-HECTOR B CERVANTES was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2481

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEGANN ANN-ROMERO CERVANTES

Respondent

HECTOR BRYANT CERVANTES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 07/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/10/2017 OF MEGANN CERVANTES FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/10/2017 OF MEGANN CERVANTES ORDERED ENTERED 07/19/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 07/13/18 BY MEGANN ANN-ROMERO CERVANTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST HECTOR BRYANT CERVANTES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 08/10/2017 OF MEGANN CERVANTES AS TO HECTOR BRYANT CERVANTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF MEGANN ANN-ROMERO CERVANTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MEGANN ANN-ROMERO CERVANTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MEGANN ANN-ROMERO CERVANTES FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY MEGANN CERVANTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HECTOR BRYANT CERVANTES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170810-0132 $435.00; 170810-0132-DB Reference Number 031-0034297882

    Read MoreRead Less