This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 07:10:57 (UTC).

MEGAN JOHNSON -V- SAMY RASH

Case Summary

On 03/19/2012 MEGAN JOHNSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAMY RASH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0012

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEGAN JOHNSON

Respondent

SAMY RASH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

03/14/2013

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 03/14/13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2013

DocketFAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/19/2012 OF MEGAN JOHNSON FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/19/2012 OF MEGAN JOHNSON ORDERED ENTERED 03/14/13; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2013

DocketDECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON SAMY RASH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2013

DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SAMY RASH FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2013

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/19/2012 OF MEGAN JOHNSON AS TO SAMY RASH.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2013

DocketDECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MEGAN JOHNSON FOR FINAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2013

DocketINCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MEGAN JOHNSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2012

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SAMY RASH; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/28/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketFILING FEE WAIVED ON MEGAN JOHNSON FOR FIRST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketFAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketFAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MEGAN JOHNSON.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MEGAN JOHNSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2012

DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less