This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:12:17 (UTC).

MEGAN CASTILLO -V- ARGOSY UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MEGAN CASTILLO -V- ARGOSY UNIVERSITY was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1405

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEGAN CASTILLO

Defendant

ARGOSY UNIVERSITY,INLAND EMPIRE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: COLLEGE TRANSCRIPTS/LETTER OF VERIFICATION FILED BY MEGAN CASTILLO

DECLARATION RE: COLLEGE TRANSCRIPTS/LETTER OF VERIFICATION FILED BY MEGAN CASTILLO

STIPULATION RE: TO BINDING ARBITRATION FILED.

STIPULATION RE: TO BINDING ARBITRATION FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED

ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED; Minutes; ON DEFENDANTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: COURT ORDERED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON STIP TO BINDING ARBITRATION BY MAIL ON 02/08/18 AS TO MEGAN CASTILLO, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON STIP TO BINDING ARBITRATION BY MAIL ON 02/08/18 AS TO MEGAN CASTILLO, FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON STIP TO BINDING ARBITRATION BY MAIL ON 02/08/18 AS TO MEGAN CASTILLO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED; Minutes; ON DEFENDANTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: COURT ORDERED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DEFENDANT ARGOSY UNIVERSITY,INLAND EMPIRE FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: TO BINDING ARBITRATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ARGOSY UNIVERSITY,INLAND EMPIRE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180126-0302 $435.00; 180126-0302-CK Reference Number 8107

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: COLLEGE TRANSCRIPTS/LETTER OF VERIFICATION FILED BY MEGAN CASTILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MEGAN CASTILLO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MEGAN CASTILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MEGAN CASTILLO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less