This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:07:56 (UTC).

MEDTRAINER, INC.-V-LEEDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MEDTRAINER, INC -V-LEEDS was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9405

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDTRAINERS, INC.

Defendants

WHITEFROG

MATTHEW LEEDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TODD M FRIEDMAN

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TANYA L. WILLIS

545 N. Mountain Ave Suite 210

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MEDTRAINERS, INC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MEDTRAINERS, INC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MATTHEW LEEDS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MATTHEW LEEDS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WHITEFROG FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WHITEFROG FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WHITEFROG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $254.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WHITEFROG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $254.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MATTHEW LEEDS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $254.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MATTHEW LEEDS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $254.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0488 $435.00; 171004-0488-CK Reference Number #115860

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MEDTRAINERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MATTHEW LEEDS, WHITEFROG FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180801-0294 $6.00; 180801-0294-MC Reference Number 030357

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY MATTHEW LEEDS, WHITEFROG; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF TANYA L. WILLIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS OF DEFS FILED BY DEFENDANT MATTHEW LEEDS, WHITEFROG; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW LEEDS, WHITEFROG.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO MATTHEW LEEDS, WHITEFROG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • HEARING RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS AND FUTURE DATES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AND REVIEWED THE STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS.; THE COURT HEREBY SIGNS THE STIPULATION AND ALSO VACATES THE MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS OF; DEFENDANTS CURRENTLY ON CALENDAR ON 7/24/18 AND THE DEFAULT HEARING CURRENTLY ON CALENDAR; 7/27/18 AS THE HEARINGS ARE NOW MOOT.; THE COURT CONFIRMS THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DATE CURRENTLY SET ON 9/6/18 AT 8:30AM IN; DEPARTMENT S24.; HEARINGS:; VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; VACATE DEFHG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; HEARING DATE OF 09/06/18 CONFIRMED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/18/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MATTHEW LEEDS, WHITEFROG FOR FAX FILING OF ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180626-0219 $3.00; 180626-0219-MC Reference Number 033-0074061928

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MATTHEW LEEDS, WHITEFROG FOR STIP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180626-0221 $20.00; 180626-0221-MC Reference Number 033-0074061928

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WHITEFROG FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF MEDTRAINERS, INC. AS TO WHITEFROG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WHITEFROG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $254.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MATTHEW LEEDS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $254.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0488 $435.00; 171004-0488-CK Reference Number #115860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less