Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 07:47:06 (UTC).

MEDINA-V-GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 MEDINA-V-GOMEZ was filed as a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2464

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA

MARTHA ELIZA CASILLAS DE MEDINA

MARELY MEDINA

VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA JR

MARTHA ELIZA CASILLA DE MEDINA

Defendants

GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD

FONTANA MATERNITY & FAMILY MEDICAL CLINIC

Plaintiffs and Minors

MARELY MEDINA

VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorney

RAYNES ERICKSON

300 E State St. Suite 690

Redlands, CA 92373

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUNITY POLICIES FOR PLAINTIFF & NON-PARTY MINOR CHILDREN FILED.

PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUNITY POLICIES FOR PLAINTIFF & NON-PARTY MINOR CHILDREN FILED.

ORDER FOR COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR-MARELY MEDINA FILED

ORDER FOR COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR-MARELY MEDINA FILED

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR- VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA JR FILED

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR- VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA JR FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/28/2015 OF VICTOR MEDINA BY MARTHA ELIZA CASILLAS DE MEDINA.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/28/2015 OF VICTOR MEDINA BY MARTHA ELIZA CASILLAS DE MEDINA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL, TRIAL READINESS AND RELATED DISCOV FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE TRIAL, TRIAL READINESS AND RELATED DISCOV FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA, MARTHA ELIZA CASILLAS DE MEDINA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA, MARTHA ELIZA CASILLAS DE MEDINA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD.

ANSWER FILED BY GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

ANSWER FILED BY GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/15 WITH COSTS OF $54.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/15 WITH COSTS OF $54.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FONTANA MATERNITY &FAMILY MEDICAL CLINIC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/16/15 WITH COSTS OF $69.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FONTANA MATERNITY &FAMILY MEDICAL CLINIC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/16/15 WITH COSTS OF $69.95 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 04/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 04/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • VACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUNITY POLICIES FOR PLAINTIFF & NON-PARTY MINOR CHILDREN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • FILE ROUTED TO S31 FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR-MARELY MEDINA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION MINOR- VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA JR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GUILLERMO J GOMEZ MD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/15 WITH COSTS OF $54.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FONTANA MATERNITY &FAMILY MEDICAL CLINIC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/16/15 WITH COSTS OF $69.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/28/2015 OF VICTOR MEDINA, FONTANA MATERNITY &FAMILY MEDICAL CLINIC IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VICTOR DANIEL MEDINA, MARTHA ELIZA CASILLAS DE MEDINA FOR NEW FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150828-2467 $435.00; 150828-2467-CK Reference Number 6802

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less