Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 09:19:19 (UTC).

MEADOW SQUARE VS OROSCO

Case Summary

On 08/19/2010 MEADOW SQUARE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OROSCO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0463

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENTS

Defendant

JENNA R. OROSCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

7676 Hazard Center Drive Ste 900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( SASE ); Minutes; Receipt: 120713-0476 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,743.68 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DECLARATION OF D. PATRICK OLAUGHLIN, ESQ PURSUANT TO CCP 695.220 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $221.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY EXPIRED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( SASE ); Minutes; Receipt: 110517-1851 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $625.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $87.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • DECLARATION OF ADRIENNE R. KELLY PURSUANT TO CCP 695.220 REGARDIG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • DECLARATION OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF RECORD OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2010
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $103.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTY BIN FOR P/U); Minutes; Receipt: 100830-1276 $25.00; 100830-1276-CK Reference Number 423361

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JENNA R. OROSCO; PARTY SERVED ON 08/21/10 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JENNA R. OROSCO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/19/2010 OF MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENTS AS TO JENNA R. OROSCO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/19/2010 OF MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENTS ORDERED ENTERED 08/30/10; JUDGMENT FOR: MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENTS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JENNA R. OROSCO; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JENNA R. OROSCO. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100819-2424 $235.00; 100819-2424-CK Reference Number 422775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less