This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:46:48 (UTC).

MCMILLIN-V-MOBILITY CENTER

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 MCMILLIN-V-MOBILITY CENTER was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0968

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEAN MCMILLIN M MCMILLIN

Defendant

THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0769 $65.00; 160201-0769-EZ Reference Number 6M902952R0192982

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:40; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SEAN MCMILLIN M MCMILLIN PRESENT; THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC REPRESENTED BY OMER SHALIKAR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- SEAN MCMILLIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; OMER SHALIKAR IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/01/2016 OF SEAN MCMILLIN ORDERED ENTERED 03/23/16; JUDGMENT FOR: SEAN MCMILLIN M MCMILLIN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,495.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $65.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,560.00; 11:01; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/24/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:40; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SEAN MCMILLIN M MCMILLIN PRESENT; THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC REPRESENTED BY OMER SHALIKAR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- SEAN MCMILLIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; OMER SHALIKAR IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 02/01/2016 OF SEAN MCMILLIN ORDERED ENTERED 03/23/16; JUDGMENT FOR: SEAN MCMILLIN M MCMILLIN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,495.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $65.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,560.00; 11:01; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC; PARTY SERVED ON 02/04/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • PARTY THE MOBILITY CENTER, INC UPDATED: NAME OF PLAINTIFF AS STATED IN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • TRACKING #9590 9402 1260 5246 9626 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 6M902952R0192982M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0769 $65.00; 160201-0769-EZ Reference Number 6M902952R0192982

    Read MoreRead Less