This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 17:01:21 (UTC).

MCMILLAN VS FLORES

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MCMILLAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7148

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCELLUS JERMAINE MCMILLAN

Defendant

LUIS ANGEL FLORES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO LUIS ANGEL FLORES; PARTY SERVED ON 09/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO LUIS ANGEL FLORES; PARTY SERVED ON 09/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARCELLUS JERMAINE MCMILLAN, LUIS ANGEL FLORES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:04; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: -.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); 11:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARCELLUS JERMAINE MCMILLAN, LUIS ANGEL FLORES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:04; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: -.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); 11:04; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARCELLUS JERMAINE MCMILLAN PRESENT; DEFENDANT LUIS ANGEL FLORES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NOT RECORDED; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/15/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • POS - SIGNED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO LUIS ANGEL FLORES; PARTY SERVED ON 09/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0503 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARCELLUS JERMAINE MCMILLAN FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0505 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0500 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less