This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:55:49 (UTC).

MCDOWELL -V- CW HOTELS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 MCDOWELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CW HOTELS, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9080

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JSM HOLDINGS, LLC., A LIMITED LIABILITY

CW HOTELS, LLC

SUSAN CHUN

COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A

SAINATH CORPORATION

IOW HOSPITALITY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY

S.D. INFINITY, LLC

KIMBERLY PARK

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARNS & KARNS, LLP

10801 National Blvd Suite 335

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS

3333 14 Th St

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, JSM HOLDINGS, LLC.,A LIMITED LIABILITY, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, JSM HOLDINGS, LLC.,A LIMITED LIABILITY, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2019 OF CW HOTELS, LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2019 OF CW HOTELS, LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS BY CW HOTELS, LLC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS BY CW HOTELS, LLC

ANSWER FILED BY JSM HOLDINGS, LLC.,A LIMITED LIABILITY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

ANSWER FILED BY JSM HOLDINGS, LLC.,A LIMITED LIABILITY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF MCDOWELL NAMING DOES 1 TO BE KIMBERLY PARK FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF MCDOWELL NAMING DOES 1 TO BE KIMBERLY PARK FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

ANSWER FILED BY COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

ANSWER FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, SUSAN CHUN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

ANSWER FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, SUSAN CHUN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON S.D. INFINITY, LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/07/19 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON S.D. INFINITY, LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/07/19 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A SERVED ON 01/04/19 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A SERVED ON 01/04/19 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190523-0538 $5.00; 190523-0538-VS Reference Number 033-0129817720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO S.D. INFINITY, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA GUERRERO; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MIA HONG APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR KINKLE, RODIGER & SPRIGGS FOR DEFENDANT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO EFFECT SERVICE ON REMAINING DEFENDANTS; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 190422-0076 $8.00; 190422-0076-VS Reference Number 09130G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CW HOTELS, LLC, JSM HOLDINGS, LLC.,A LIMITED LIABILITY, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR CW HOTELS, LLC, JSM HOLDINGS, LLC.,A LIMITED LIABILITY, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN.; Minutes; Receipt: 190326-0497 $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CW HOTELS, LLC, JSM HOLDINGS, LLC.,A LIMITED LIABILITY, COUNTRY INN & SUITES BY RADISSON, INC., A, SUSAN CHUN FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 190326-0495 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2018
  • SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SUMMONS MUST MATCH COMPLAINT EXACTLY. CORRCT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/09/2018 OF VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS, S.D. INFINITY, LLC, SUSAN CHUN IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 181113-0643 $17.00; 181113-0643-VS Reference Number 033-0096118214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VICTORIA MCDOWELL,INDIVIDUALLYAND AS FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 181113-0639 $435.00; 181113-0639-VS Reference Number 033-0096118214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.