This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:31:07 (UTC).

MCCOY-V-CORMIER

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MCCOY-V-CORMIER was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9496

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY MCCOY

Defendant

JOHN ALEXANDER CORMIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JILL SUZANNE BRESLAU

815 Moraga Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90049

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0795 $435.00; 171004-0795-CK Reference Number CK 240606

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE 3850-3865 * FILED.

NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE 3850-3865 * FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE 3850-3865 * FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TIMOTHY MCCOY FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0796 $435.00; 171004-0796-CK Reference Number CK 240606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0795 $435.00; 171004-0795-CK Reference Number CK 240606

    Read MoreRead Less