This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 06:13:01 (UTC).

MAZUREK V JKH HOLDING LLC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 MAZUREK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JKH HOLDING LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1516

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMMY D MAZUREK

Defendants

JK HARRIS & COMPANY LLC

JKH HOLDING LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM JK HARRIS & COMPANY LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM JKH HOLDING LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL AMENDED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/04/2011 OF JIMMY MAZUREK, JK HARRIS & COMPANYLLC IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110812-0791 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY JIMMY D MAZUREK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM JKH HOLDING LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: ANCHALEE M PRICE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; 02:38; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JIMMY D MAZUREK PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JKH HOLDING LLC; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- JIMMY D MAZUREK IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS SERVICE WAS PROPER AND VALID. NOTICES WERE SENT TO AN UPDATED ADDRESS.; JKH HOLDING LLC NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JKH HOLDING LLC.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT JIMMY D MAZUREK HAVE &; RECOVER FROM JKH HOLDING LLC:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,100.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,170.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ; ACTION - COMPLETE; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 06/27/11; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/24/11

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 110509-1376 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • 70102780000052345691 TO JKH HOLDING LLC AGENT FOR SERVICE SCOTT BRUMFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • UPDATE PARTY ADDRESS FOR JKH HOLDING LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF OF JIMMY MAZUREK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIVED BACK FOR ORIGINAL CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CERT MAIL70102780000052346155 TO JKH HOLDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-1079 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-1001 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less