This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:19:38 (UTC).

MAYROCK-V-CHAN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MAYROCK-V-CHAN was filed as a Contract - Business lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7839

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAYROCK INCOPORATED

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WINNIE CHAN

Cross Defendants

SUPER-U INTERNATIONAL INC

WESTWING EXPRESS LLC

MAYROCK INCORPORATED

COSTGO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH & MYERS LLP

333 South Hope Street 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SUH LAW GROUP APC

3810 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1212

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT AS SOON AS POSSIBLE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION OF THOMAS MYERS FILED

DECLARATION OF THOMAS MYERS FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER TO REDACT COMPLAINT FILED

ORDER TO REDACT COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WINNIE CHAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WINNIE CHAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS SMITH & MYERS LLP FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING MAYROCK INCOPORATED, MAYROCK INCORPORATED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • ORDER RE REDACTING FIRST FIVE DIGITS OF SOCIAL ON PAGE 1 EXHIBIT 1 OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MAYROCK INCORPORATED FOR DECLARATION/ORDER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180814-1046 $20.00; 180814-1046-CK Reference Number #5948

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DECLARATION OF THOMAS MYERS RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/10/2018 OF WINNIE CHAN - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT/ANSWER FILED AS TO MAYROCK INCORPORATED. PARTY SERVED ON 08/09/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MAYROCK INCOPORATED BY WINNIE CHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY WINNIE CHAN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SUH LAW GROUP APC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEF FILED BY DEFENDANT WINNIE CHAN; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WINNIE CHAN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT AS SOON AS POSSIBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MAYROCK INCOPORATED FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0935 $435.00; 170914-0935-CK Reference Number 5411

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MAYROCK INCOPORATED FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less