This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 09:38:18 (UTC).

MAY LAM -V- TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, ETAL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2011 MAY LAM filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mahlum, Kirtland L and Morton, Miriam I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0016

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Mahlum, Kirtland L

Morton, Miriam I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAY LAM

Defendants

TOYOTA MOTORCORP

TOYOTA MOTOR NORTHAMERICA, INC

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL ROOFIAN AND ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF BOWMAN & BROOKE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

02/22/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STA

02/13/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STA

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MAY

07/25/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MAY

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TOYO

07/20/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TOYO

 

Docket Entries

05/15/2013

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2013

DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2013
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2013

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2013
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2012

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Morton, Miriam I; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MIRIAM I. MORTON,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA RAMIREZ MINUTES UPDATED BY BECKY GENOVESI COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON;7137 BAILIFF: WOOLLEY - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY GENIE CHOU APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MAY LAM. ATTORNEY JIMMY PARK APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, TOYOTA MOTORCORP. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. COUNSEL AGREE TO DO PRIVATE MEDIATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/15/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2012

DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Morton, Miriam I; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Party's motion; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20120726-0367; ConversionPayment; $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2012

DocketAdvanced Jury Fees Posted; Comment: ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR MAY LAM. 120726-0367-CK JFN/ 150.00 PAYMT 120726-0367-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 6330

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
10/13/2011

DocketProof of Service; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 10/13/2011; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/12/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS AGENT. WITH FEES OF $51.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2011

DocketProof of Service; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 10/13/2011; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO TOYOTA MOTOR NORTHAMERICA, INC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/12/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS AGENT. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2011

DocketProof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/12/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS AGENT. WITH FEES OF $51.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2011

DocketProof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO TOYOTA MOTOR NORTHAMERICA, INC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/12/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS AGENT. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2011

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $545.00; Total Payments and Credits: $545.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2011

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2011

DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MAY LAM, TOYOTA MOTORCORP IS ADDED AS A DEF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2011

DocketSummons Issued on; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF MAY LAM - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2011

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2011

DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 120110-1617-CK CVG/ 395.00 PAYMT 120110-1617-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 20811

[+] Read More [-] Read Less