This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:30:18 (UTC).

MAURINE TINNEY AKA GERTRUDE AMMONS

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MAURINE TINNEY AKA GERTRUDE AMMONS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0960

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KRISTA WAGNER

LARRY WAYNE AMMONS

GARY AMMONS

Decedent

MAURINE TINNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MADDUX, MICHAEL C

1894 Commercenter Drive West Ste 108

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL /CONTINUED REQUEST TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND CONTIUED OBJECTION TO LARRY AMMONS FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL /CONTINUED REQUEST TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND CONTIUED OBJECTION TO LARRY AMMONS FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL /CONTINUED REQUEST TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND CONTIUED OBJECTION TO LARRY AMMONS FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL /CONTINUED REQUEST TO PETITION FOR PROBATE AND CONTIUED OBJECTION TO LARRY AMMONS FILED. (IMAGED)

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,177.32.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,177.32.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,177.32.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,177.32.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX FILED BY LARRY WAYNE AMMONS.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX FILED BY LARRY WAYNE AMMONS.

NOTICE TO EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPT FILED BY LARRY WAYNE AMMONS.

NOTICE TO EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPT FILED BY LARRY WAYNE AMMONS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, LARRY WAYNE AMMONS APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, LARRY WAYNE AMMONS APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

DECLARATION OF OF CARLOS JARAMILLO FILED

DECLARATION OF OF CARLOS JARAMILLO FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH MICHAEL C MADDUX AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR LARRY WAYNE AMMONS.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH MICHAEL C MADDUX AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR LARRY WAYNE AMMONS.

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CREDITORS CLAIM,OBJ TO LARRY AMMONS PETITION BY MAIL ON 01/30/18 AS TO LARRY AMMONS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CREDITORS CLAIM,OBJ TO LARRY AMMONS PETITION BY MAIL ON 01/30/18 AS TO LARRY AMMONS, FILED.

OBJECTION TO LARRY AMMONS NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER

OBJECTION TO LARRY AMMONS NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • REPORT SALE AND PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • OBJECTION TO MICHAEL C MADDUXS REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/12/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF KRISTA WAGNER FILED ON 12/20/17 IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,177.32 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • POSTING NOTICE OF HEARING RE: REPORT OF SALE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • REPORT OF SALE AND PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KRISTA WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less