This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:02:32 (UTC).

MATTHEW DUNPHY-N-DANA DUNPHY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MATTHEW DUNPHY-N-DANA DUNPHY was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0618

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATTHEW B DUNPHY

Respondent

DANA A DUNPHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • NEJ MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 11/07/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MATTHEW DUNPHY FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MATTHEW DUNPHY ORDERED ENTERED 11/07/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MISSING FL-130 OR REQUEST A HEARING .; Minutes; ANGELES LEGAL SERVICES BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR MATTHEW B DUNPHY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MATTHEW B DUNPHY FOR BOTH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 09/22/17 BY MATTHEW B DUNPHY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DISSO/UCCJEA BY MAIL ON 02/02/17 AS TO MATTHEW B DUNPHY, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 12/14/2016 OF MATTHEW DUNPHY BY DANA A DUNPHY FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 170202-0629 $435.00; 170202-0629-VS Reference Number 031-0006103418

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0668 $435.00; 161214-0668-CK Reference Number 1059

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.