This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:42:15 (UTC).

MATTER OF CHARISSE LEROY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MATTER OF CHARISSE LEROY was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0526

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHARISSE LEROY

Minor

RYAN JOSEPH LEROY

 

Court Documents

OSC RE: NAME- CHANGE FILED BY CHARISSE LEROY.

OSC RE: NAME- CHANGE FILED BY CHARISSE LEROY.

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL ON 01/03/18 AS TO JASON ALLEN WATERS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL ON 01/03/18 AS TO JASON ALLEN WATERS, FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION AS TO OSC RE NAME CHANGE * FILED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION AS TO OSC RE NAME CHANGE * FILED

DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM RYAN JOSEPH LEROY TO RYAN JOSEPH LEROY WATERS FILED.

DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM RYAN JOSEPH LEROY TO RYAN JOSEPH LEROY WATERS FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM RYAN JOSEPH LEROY TO RYAN JOSEPH LEROY WATERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION AS TO OSC RE NAME CHANGE * FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL ON 01/03/18 AS TO JASON ALLEN WATERS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME- CHANGE FILED BY CHARISSE LEROY.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SUSAN F SLATER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: EBONY SHAW; NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: R CARTER; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CHARISSE LEROY PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE NAME CHANGE.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OSC/MOTION HELD.; PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.; WITNESS -- CHARISSE LEROY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT FINDS:; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION SUFFICIENT AND TRUE.; PETITION RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED 09/27/2017 OF CHARISSE LEROY IS GRANTED; DECREE CHANGING NAME IS SIGNED BY THE COURT.; HENCEFORTH THE MINOR'S NAME SHALL BE RYAN JOSEPH LEROY WATERS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • ON THE PETITION RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED 09/27/2017 OF CHARISSE LEROY, RYAN JOSEPH LEROY IS ADDED AS A MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME- CHANGE FILED BY CHARISSE LEROY.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; SUSAN F SLATER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CATHY HOWDEN; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CHARISSE LEROY PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PETITIONER.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER CONTINUED TO ALLOW PETITIONER TO FILE THE PROOF OF PUBLICATION AND; TO GIVE NOTICE TO THE FATHER OF THE CHILD.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/03/18 AT 08:29 IN DEPARTMENT V15.; HEARINGS:; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHARISSE LEROY IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHARISSE LEROY FOR FIRST APPEANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHARISSE LEROY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DEC REE PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC RE: NAME- CHANGE FILED BY CHARISSE LEROY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO V15

    Read MoreRead Less