This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 03:38:22 (UTC).

MATA -V- LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 12/08/2016 MATA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0859

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF

Defendants

LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A

STACY LYNN KONIER

BARRY KONIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF LEVIK YARIAN APLC

700 N Central Ave Ste 470

Glendale, CA 91203

SAHAGUN LAW

4505 Allstate Dr Suite 102

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH SAHAGUN LAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH SAHAGUN LAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH SAHAGUN LAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH SAHAGUN LAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A FILED.

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,647.44

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,647.44

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF LEVIKYARIAN APLC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF LEVIKYARIAN APLC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A, STACY LYNN KONIER, BARRY KONIER.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A, STACY LYNN KONIER, BARRY KONIER.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR STACY LYNN KONIER AKA STACY GRIFFIN FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR STACY LYNN KONIER AKA STACY GRIFFIN FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR BARRY KONIER AND INDIVIDUAL FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR BARRY KONIER AND INDIVIDUAL FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STACY LYNN KONIER SERVED ON 02/07/17 WITH FEES OF $69.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO STACY LYNN KONIER SERVED ON 02/07/17 WITH FEES OF $69.00.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUBSITUTIED SERVICE MAILED ON 2/07/17 AS TO LANDSCAPE WEST FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUBSITUTIED SERVICE MAILED ON 2/07/17 AS TO LANDSCAPE WEST FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BARRY KONIER SERVED ON 02/02/17 WITH FEES OF $69.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BARRY KONIER SERVED ON 02/02/17 WITH FEES OF $69.00.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( 56097.16 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180604-0337 $25.00; 180604-0337-CK Reference Number 12617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,647.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH SAHAGUN LAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PARTY JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF LEVIKYARIAN APLC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • REQ FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT WAS PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 9/12/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/08/2016 OF JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/08/2016 OF JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF ORDERED ENTERED 09/12/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LANDSCAPE WEST MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., A, STACY LYNN KONIER, BARRY KONIER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $44,279.70 INTEREST $1,287.63 ATTORNEY FEES $4,800.00 COSTS $2,057.39 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $52,424.72; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOSE MATA IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS MUST ON JC FORM SUM-200A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/08/2016 OF JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF, STACY LYNN KONIER, BARRY KONIER IS ADDED AS A DEFS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • PLAINTIFF JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE MATA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ON BEHALF OF FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 161208-0941 $435.00; 161208-0941-CK Reference Number CK#3494525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MISSING COA/RETURNED SUMMONS SENT.; Minutes; SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT MUST MATCH EXACTLY. ALSO PLEASE SUBMIT MISSING LOCAL FORM CERTITICATE OF; ASSIGNMENT WHICH CAN BE FOUND ON OUR COURT WEBSITE UNDER FORMS AND RULES.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less